THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:35:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SERBIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 McIntosh Drive
unit 206
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-201-8606
Fax: (905)-472-2754
Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Extension: 3069
Fax: (905) 883-2052
Address: 61586 - 9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0C9
Phone: 905-305-8787
Fax: 905-305-8783

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 08 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Jevremovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jevremovic (CPSO#: 72371 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 8787 Woodbine Avenue
Suite 118
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
(905) 305-8787
Business Address: 50 McIntosh Dr
116
Markham ON L3R 9T3
905-201-8606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SERBIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 McIntosh Drive
unit 206
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-201-8606
Fax: (905)-472-2754
Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Extension: 3069
Fax: (905) 883-2052
Address: 61586 - 9350 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0C9
Phone: 905-305-8787
Fax: 905-305-8783

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 08 Sep 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Jevremovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jevremovic (CPSO#: 72371 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 8787 Woodbine Avenue
Suite 118
Markham Ontario L3R 9S2
(905) 305-8787
Business Address: 50 McIntosh Dr
116
Markham ON L3R 9T3
905-201-8606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA JEVREMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEVREMOVIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA JEVREMOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEVREMOVIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2006
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2006

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998