THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:38:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-682-6151
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Dinniwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dinniwell (CPSO#: 72375 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
9056826451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
Walker Family Cancer Centre
Niagara Health
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-682-6151
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Dinniwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dinniwell (CPSO#: 72375 )
Business Address: London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
9056826451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD DINNIWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINNIWELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD DINNIWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINNIWELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998