THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Unit 109
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476141611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305 Milner Avenue
Unit 920
Toronto Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: 4163213883
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ulana B. Kawun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Kawun (CPSO#: 72378 )
Business Address: 920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
(416) 321-3883
Business Address: Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 283-7338

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3075 Hospital Gate
Unit 109
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476141611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 305 Milner Avenue
Unit 920
Toronto Ontario M1B 3V4
Phone: 4163213883
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ulana B. Kawun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Kawun (CPSO#: 72378 )
Business Address: 920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3V4
(416) 321-3883
Business Address: Suite 407
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 283-7338

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ULANA BOHDANKA KAWUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ULANA BOHDANKA KAWUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998