THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Internal Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room D107B
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4473
Fax: (613) 761-4186

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Code Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Code (CPSO#: 72381 )
Business Address: D107B
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4473

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Internal Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Room D107B
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4473
Fax: (613) 761-4186

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catherine Code Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Code (CPSO#: 72381 )
Business Address: D107B
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4473

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE CHRISTINA CODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CODE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE CHRISTINA CODE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CODE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998