THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:34:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kester-Greene, Nicole Maree (Used Until: 25 Dec 2022) Kester, Nicole Maree (Used Until: 13 Jul 1998)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview St
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4037
Fax: (416) 480-4704

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kester (CPSO#: 72393 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: Kester-Greene, Nicole Maree (Used Until: 25 Dec 2022) Kester, Nicole Maree (Used Until: 13 Jul 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview St
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 4037
Fax: (416) 480-4704

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kester Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kester (CPSO#: 72393 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MAREE KESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE MAREE KESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998