THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Osmania University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
61 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3722
Fax: (416) 867-3709

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. V. Ramesh Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Prasad (CPSO#: 72402 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
9th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-3722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Osmania University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
61 Queen Street East
9th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 867-3722
Fax: (416) 867-3709

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. V. Ramesh Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Prasad (CPSO#: 72402 )
Business Address: St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
9th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-3722

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GANGAVARAPU VENKATA RAMESH PRASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRASAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GANGAVARAPU VENKATA RAMESH PRASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRASAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Osmania University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998