THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:36:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: (705) 675-4794

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee Toner and Dr. Louise Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Logan (CPSO#: 71686 ) Dr. L. Toner (CPSO#: 72427 )
Business Address: 2120 Regent Street South
Unit 3
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 523-3633
Business Address: West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
(705) 753-3110
Business Address: N. Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 662-7215
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 675-4700
Fax: (705) 675-4794

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lee Toner and Dr. Louise Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Logan (CPSO#: 71686 ) Dr. L. Toner (CPSO#: 72427 )
Business Address: 2120 Regent Street South
Unit 3
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 523-3633
Business Address: West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
(705) 753-3110
Business Address: N. Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 662-7215
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEE VICTOR TONER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEE VICTOR TONER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998