THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:23:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Box 912
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nicholas (CPSO#: 72435 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70171
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 70178

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Box 912
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 70175
Fax: (613) 247-3511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nicholas (CPSO#: 72435 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-7700 Extn: 70171
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 70178

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARTH ANDREW NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARTH ANDREW NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998