THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:37:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Civic Hospital
Orthopaedics Department
Room J135
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18131
Fax: (888) 914-7099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Papp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Papp (CPSO#: 72439 )
Business Address: Ottawa Civic Hospital
Orthopaedics Department
Room J135
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Civic Hospital
Orthopaedics Department
Room J135
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 18131
Fax: (888) 914-7099

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Papp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Papp (CPSO#: 72439 )
Business Address: Ottawa Civic Hospital
Orthopaedics Department
Room J135
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN RAY PAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN RAY PAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998