THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:19:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prince Edward Family Health Team
35 Bridge St
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 476-0400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kim D. Haigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haigh (CPSO#: 72450 )
Business Address: 403 Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-2181
Business Address: 3-35 Bridge St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-471-1493

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Prince Edward Family Health Team
35 Bridge St
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 476-0400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kim D. Haigh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haigh (CPSO#: 72450 )
Business Address: 403 Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
(613) 476-2181
Business Address: 3-35 Bridge St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-471-1493

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM DIANE HAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM DIANE HAIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998