THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:17:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 38 Pine St N
Timmins ON P4N 6K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 264 1881
Fax: 705 267 4212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judy Gillies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gillies (CPSO#: 72460 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 38 Pine St N
Timmins ON P4N 6K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 264 1881
Fax: 705 267 4212

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Aug 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 09 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Judy Gillies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gillies (CPSO#: 72460 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDY ROXANNE MARIE GILLIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUDY ROXANNE MARIE GILLIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLIES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998