THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:37:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gravelle, Anne Catharine (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Gravelle, Anne Catharine (Used Until: 07 Jun 2004)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 741-6767
Fax: (613) 741-4147
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Gravelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gravelle (CPSO#: 72461 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Suite 200B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
(613) 741-6767

General Information

Former Name: Gravelle, Anne Catharine (Used Until: 10 Sep 2020) Gravelle, Anne Catharine (Used Until: 07 Jun 2004)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 741-6767
Fax: (613) 741-4147
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 15 Dec 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anne Gravelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gravelle (CPSO#: 72461 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Suite 200B
745 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
(613) 741-6767

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHARINE ANNE GRAVELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVELLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHARINE ANNE GRAVELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVELLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998