THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:40:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Rheumatology
Toronto Western Hospital
Ground Floor East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-6417
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Address: Scleroderma Clinic
Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor, Joseph & Wolf Lebovic Bl
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8549
Fax: (416) 586-8766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wijeysundera Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wijeysundera (CPSO#: 72422 ) Dr. S. Johnson (CPSO#: 72469 )
Business Address: Uhn - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3-450, Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8981
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
Suite 2-0009
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-5800 Extn: 8247
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Ground Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6417

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Rheumatology
Toronto Western Hospital
Ground Floor East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-6417
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Address: Scleroderma Clinic
Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor, Joseph & Wolf Lebovic Bl
60 Murray Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8549
Fax: (416) 586-8766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wijeysundera Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wijeysundera (CPSO#: 72422 ) Dr. S. Johnson (CPSO#: 72469 )
Business Address: Uhn - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Suite 3-450, Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8981
Business Address: 60 Murray Street
Suite 2-0009
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
(416) 586-5800 Extn: 8247
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Rheumatology
Ground Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-6417

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINDHU ROSE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SINDHU ROSE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998