THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:14:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: Levac, Marie-France Jeanne (Used Until: 20 Jul 2003)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139384240
Fax: 8884652260
Address: 101 TEWESATENI ROAD
Akwesasne Ontario K6H 0G5
Phone: 613-932-5808
Fax: (888)-465-6620
Address: 31 HILLTOP DRIVE PO BOX 220
Saint-Regis Quebec H0M 1A0
Phone: 613-575-2341
Extension: 2228
Fax: (888) 465-6620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M-F. Levac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levac (CPSO#: 72476 )
Business Address: 116 BLVD Lionel Emond
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 1W7
(819) 966-6200 Extn: 5476
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 938-4615
Business Address: 31 Hilltop Drive
P O Box 220
Akwesasne Quebec H0M 1A0
(613) 575-2341 Extn: 3247
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131 Extn: 2226
Business Address: 101 Tewesateni Road
Akwesasne Ontario K6H 0G5
(613) 932-5808

General Information

Former Name: Levac, Marie-France Jeanne (Used Until: 20 Jul 2003)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139384240
Fax: 8884652260
Address: 101 TEWESATENI ROAD
Akwesasne Ontario K6H 0G5
Phone: 613-932-5808
Fax: (888)-465-6620
Address: 31 HILLTOP DRIVE PO BOX 220
Saint-Regis Quebec H0M 1A0
Phone: 613-575-2341
Extension: 2228
Fax: (888) 465-6620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 15 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M-F. Levac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levac (CPSO#: 72476 )
Business Address: 116 BLVD Lionel Emond
Gatineau Quebec J8Y 1W7
(819) 966-6200 Extn: 5476
Business Address: 840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 938-4615
Business Address: 31 Hilltop Drive
P O Box 220
Akwesasne Quebec H0M 1A0
(613) 575-2341 Extn: 3247
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 267-2131 Extn: 2226
Business Address: 101 Tewesateni Road
Akwesasne Ontario K6H 0G5
(613) 932-5808

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-FRANCE LEVAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVAC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE-FRANCE LEVAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVAC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998