THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-6500
Fax: (905) 878-6711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Malec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Malec (CPSO#: 72488 )
Business Address: Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
(905) 878-6500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 878-6500
Fax: (905) 878-6711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Malec Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Malec (CPSO#: 72488 )
Business Address: Suite 206
470 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 2J4
(905) 878-6500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN LESLIE MALEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN LESLIE MALEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998