THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:49:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Modena, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 7B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 8560771
Fax: 9054170765

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefano Chiozza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chiozza (CPSO#: 72492 )
Business Address: 255 Timbercreek Boulevard
Kleinburg Ontario L4H 3X5
(905) 856-0771

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Modena, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 7B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 8560771
Fax: 9054170765

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stefano Chiozza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chiozza (CPSO#: 72492 )
Business Address: 255 Timbercreek Boulevard
Kleinburg Ontario L4H 3X5
(905) 856-0771

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFANO CHIOZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIOZZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEFANO CHIOZZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIOZZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Modena, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998