THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:01:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
A10-207
399 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3285
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faisal Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rehman (CPSO#: 72494 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-207
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3285

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
A10-207
399 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3285
Fax: (519) 663-3449

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 10 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faisal Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Rehman (CPSO#: 72494 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room A10-207
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3285

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
17 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 17 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 17, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Faisal Rehman in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rehman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. FAISAL REHMAN
(“Dr. Rehman”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Rehman, certificate of registration number 72494, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-402819-K5W1H2 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in inappropriate conduct with a patient or former patient in my internal medicine/nephrology practice.
(4) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the ICRC will also require me to appear before a panel of the ICRC to be cautioned.

B. UNDERTAKING
(5) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(6) Professional Education
(a) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):
(i) Individualized instruction in professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;
(ii) Review, reflection, and discussion with the instructor conducting my individualized instruction of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Essentials of Medical Professionalism, College policy;
2. Boundary Violations, College policy;
3. Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to Them, College policy;
(ii) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Third Party Medical Reports, College policy;
2. Medical Records Management, College policy;
3. Medical Records Documentation, College policy.
(b) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(7) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(11) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(12) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(13) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Rehman engaged in inappropriate conduct with a patient or former patient in his internal medicine/nephrology practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Rehman will engage in professional education in understanding and maintaining professional boundaries, expectations regarding providing third party reports, and medical recordkeeping.
(c) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Rehman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Rehman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(17) I, Dr. Rehman, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 17, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Faisal Rehman in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rehman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)

of

DR. FAISAL REHMAN
(“Dr. Rehman”)

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)
________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE
(1) In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“ICRC” means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
“IEP” means Individualized Education Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.
(2) I, Dr. Rehman, certificate of registration number 72494, am a member of the College.
(3) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-402819-K5W1H2 (the “Investigation”) into whether I engaged in inappropriate conduct with a patient or former patient in my internal medicine/nephrology practice.
(4) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the ICRC will also require me to appear before a panel of the ICRC to be cautioned.

B. UNDERTAKING
(5) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(6) Professional Education
(a) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix “A”, including all of the following professional education (the “Professional Education”):
(i) Individualized instruction in professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;
(ii) Review, reflection, and discussion with the instructor conducting my individualized instruction of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Essentials of Medical Professionalism, College policy;
2. Boundary Violations, College policy;
3. Physician Treatment of Self, Family Members, or Others Close to Them, College policy;
(ii) Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:
1. Third Party Medical Reports, College policy;
2. Medical Records Management, College policy;
3. Medical Records Documentation, College policy.
(b) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.
(d) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that if any of the self-study resources listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(7) Monitoring
(a) I, Dr. Rehman, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(9) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
(10) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(11) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
(12) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
(13) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
(14) Public Register
(a) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Rehman engaged in inappropriate conduct with a patient or former patient in his internal medicine/nephrology practice. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Rehman will engage in professional education in understanding and maintaining professional boundaries, expectations regarding providing third party reports, and medical recordkeeping.
(c) I, Dr. Rehman, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D. CONSENT
(15) I, Dr. Rehman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16) I, Dr. Rehman, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(17) I, Dr. Rehman, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;
(c) any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Faisal Rehman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2025:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Rehman engaged in inappropriate conduct with a patient or former patient in his internal medicine/nephrology practice. As a result of the investigation:
 
Dr. Rehman will engage in professional education in understanding and maintaining professional boundaries, expectations regarding providing third party reports, and medical recordkeeping.
 
 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 26 Feb 2025
Summary:
Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX1H2 
 
Caution-in-Person: 
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Faisal Rehman to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2025:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Rehman engaged in inappropriate conduct with a patient or former patient in his internal medicine/nephrology practice. As a result of the investigation:
 
Dr. Rehman will engage in professional education in understanding and maintaining professional boundaries, expectations regarding providing third party reports, and medical recordkeeping.
 
 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 26 Feb 2025
Summary:
Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX1H2 
 
Caution-in-Person: 
 
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:   

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998