THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:24:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136A Box 105
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M3N 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan Solmon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Solmon (CPSO#: 72503 )
Business Address: 1 York Gate Blvd
North York ON M3N 3A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136A Box 105
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M3N 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan Solmon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Solmon (CPSO#: 72503 )
Business Address: 1 York Gate Blvd
North York ON M3N 3A1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN BRADLEY SOLMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN BRADLEY SOLMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998