THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Christie St
Toronto ON M6G 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163925767
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Office of the Chief Coroner of
Ontario
25 Morton Shulman Ave.
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Fax: (416) 314-4030
Address: Cedarvale Terrace
Long Term Care Home
429 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2X9
Phone: (416) 967-6949
Fax: (416) 928-1965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ross (CPSO#: 72513 )
Business Address: 25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
(416) 314-4000
Business Address: 429 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2X9
(416) 967-6949
Business Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
(416) 392-5767

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 351 Christie St
Toronto ON M6G 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163925767
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Office of the Chief Coroner of
Ontario
25 Morton Shulman Ave.
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Fax: (416) 314-4030
Address: Cedarvale Terrace
Long Term Care Home
429 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2X9
Phone: (416) 967-6949
Fax: (416) 928-1965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 11 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Ross Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ross (CPSO#: 72513 )
Business Address: 25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
(416) 314-4000
Business Address: 429 Walmer Road
Toronto Ontario M5P 2X9
(416) 967-6949
Business Address: Castleview Wychwood Towers
351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
(416) 392-5767

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL EMMANUEL ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL EMMANUEL ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998