THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-0115
Fax: 519-745-3684

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Papastergiou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Papastergiou (CPSO#: 72514 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2T 2Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-0115
Fax: 519-745-3684

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Papastergiou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Papastergiou (CPSO#: 72514 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK LESLIE PAPASTERGIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPASTERGIOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK LESLIE PAPASTERGIOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPASTERGIOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998