THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:46:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198225350
Extension: 2210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: 5198241010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rhonda V. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taylor (CPSO#: 72524 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St
Guelph Ontario N1E4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198225350
Extension: 2210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Delhi St
Guelph ON N1E 6K9
Phone: 5198241010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 27 Nov 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rhonda V. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Taylor (CPSO#: 72524 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHONDA VICTORIA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHONDA VICTORIA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998