THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-721-4598
Fax: 519-742-6571
Address: #205
1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: (905) 304-0052
Address: Unit 207
10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Phone: 905-794-4497
Fax: 905-794-7258
Address: 10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Phone: 9054955200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
Phone: 2262436608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Wellington Rd. South
London Ontario N6C 4P4
Phone: (519) 433-4700
Fax: (519) 433-4702
Address: 1315 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 2G6
Phone: 416-634-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: B19-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-645-5145
Fax: 416-645-1401
Address: Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Phone: (905) 607-0022
Fax: (905) 607-0013
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 2898357555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite #4
5 Hannover Dr
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A3
Phone: (905) 684-9999
Fax: (905) 684-9985
Address: 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6L 3C9
Phone: 4166307388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiothoracic Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiothoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. K. Talwar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Talwar (CPSO#: 72534 )
Business Address: 63 Milne Drive, RR#2
Petersburg Ontario N0B2H0
519-721-4598

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-721-4598
Fax: 519-742-6571
Address: #205
1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-0062
Fax: (905) 304-0052
Address: Unit 207
10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
Phone: 905-794-4497
Fax: 905-794-7258
Address: 10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Phone: 9054955200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 260 Nebo Road
Hamilton Ontario L8W 3K5
Phone: 2262436608
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Wellington Rd. South
London Ontario N6C 4P4
Phone: (519) 433-4700
Fax: (519) 433-4702
Address: 1315 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 2G6
Phone: 416-634-0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: B19-2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-645-5145
Fax: 416-645-1401
Address: Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Phone: (905) 607-0022
Fax: (905) 607-0013
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 2898357555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite #4
5 Hannover Dr
St. Catharines Ontario L2W 1A3
Phone: (905) 684-9999
Fax: (905) 684-9985
Address: 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6L 3C9
Phone: 4166307388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiothoracic Surgery
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiothoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. K. Talwar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Talwar (CPSO#: 72534 )
Business Address: 63 Milne Drive, RR#2
Petersburg Ontario N0B2H0
519-721-4598

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR TALWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALWAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR TALWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALWAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1998