THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 01:10:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 653-1801
Fax: (705) 653-5483

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Williams (CPSO#: 72549 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Address: Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1801

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 653-1801
Fax: (705) 653-5483

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Williams (CPSO#: 72549 )
Business Address: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
Business Address: Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford Ontario K0L 1L0
(705) 653-1801

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998