THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:28:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-6955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Zawarynski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zawarynski (CPSO#: 72578 )
Business Address: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Suite 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
(519) 842-4231

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-6955

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Zawarynski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zawarynski (CPSO#: 72578 )
Business Address: Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Suite 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 5A7
(519) 842-4231

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE MARY ZAWARYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWARYNSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE MARY ZAWARYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAWARYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998