THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1433 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-0622
Fax: (905) 632-9308
Address: 3155 Harvester Road - Suite 207
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: 9056312080
Fax: 9056356215
Address: 1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cei-Whan Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kim (CPSO#: 72586 )
Business Address: 1433 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
(905) 333-0622

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1433 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-0622
Fax: (905) 632-9308
Address: 3155 Harvester Road - Suite 207
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: 9056312080
Fax: 9056356215
Address: 1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cei-Whan Kim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kim (CPSO#: 72586 )
Business Address: 1433 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G5
(905) 333-0622

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CEI-WHAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CEI-WHAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998