THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PromptDoc Urgent Care Clinic
523 Lake Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 2H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 646-0015
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 582 Ontario Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 0A2
Phone: (905) 935-1800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nishan Jayawardene Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jayawardene (CPSO#: 72587 )
Business Address: PromptDoc Urgent Care Clinic
101-523 Lake Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 4H4
(905) 646-0015

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PromptDoc Urgent Care Clinic
523 Lake Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 2H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 646-0015
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 582 Ontario Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 0A2
Phone: (905) 935-1800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nishan Jayawardene Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jan 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jayawardene (CPSO#: 72587 )
Business Address: PromptDoc Urgent Care Clinic
101-523 Lake Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 4H4
(905) 646-0015

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Apr 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHAN CHETIYA JAYAWARDENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYAWARDENE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISHAN CHETIYA JAYAWARDENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYAWARDENE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998