THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:25:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MACEDONIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
5 MC Suite 420E
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5516
Fax: (416) 603-5754
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Unit A2
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Extension: 243
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Phone: 416-883-3783
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Janevski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Janevski (CPSO#: 72588 )
Business Address: A2 - 2 Champaigne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160 Extn: 243
Business Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 5 McL 420E
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MACEDONIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
5 MC Suite 420E
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5516
Fax: (416) 603-5754
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Unit A2
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 222-6160
Extension: 243
Fax: (416) 222-9604
Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Phone: 416-883-3783
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Janevski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Janevski (CPSO#: 72588 )
Business Address: A2 - 2 Champaigne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
(416) 222-6160 Extn: 243
Business Address: 829 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Cardiac Clinic
Toronto ON M6C 1C2
Business Address: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 5 McL 420E
Toronto ON M5T 2S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JANEVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANEVSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN JANEVSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANEVSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998