THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:49:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
3rd Floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057214356
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. MIchael's Hospital
Paediatric Ambulatory Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Cammisuli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cammisuli (CPSO#: 72598 )
Business Address: Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Address: 4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4356

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Centre
3rd Floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057214356
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. MIchael's Hospital
Paediatric Ambulatory Clinic
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Cammisuli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cammisuli (CPSO#: 72598 )
Business Address: Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
Business Address: 4th Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4356

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALVATORE CAMMISULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMMISULI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALVATORE CAMMISULI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMMISULI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998