THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:51:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Gastroenterology
St Joseph's Health Care Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6125
Fax: (519) 646-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.V. Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khanna (CPSO#: 72618 )
Business Address: Division of Gastroenterology
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvernor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6125

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division of Gastroenterology
St Joseph's Health Care Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6125
Fax: (519) 646-6130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 26 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.V. Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khanna (CPSO#: 72618 )
Business Address: Division of Gastroenterology
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvernor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6125

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NITIN VERINDER KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NITIN VERINDER KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998