THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 23:35:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 206-7131 Bathurst St
Thornhill Pediatrics
Thornhill ON L4J 7Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-731-7596
Fax: 905-731-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Hershenfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hershenfield (CPSO#: 72624 )
Business Address: 206-7131 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Z1
905-731-7596

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 206-7131 Bathurst St
Thornhill Pediatrics
Thornhill ON L4J 7Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-731-7596
Fax: 905-731-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Hershenfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hershenfield (CPSO#: 72624 )
Business Address: 206-7131 Bathurst St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Z1
905-731-7596

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN MITCHELL HERSHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHENFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN MITCHELL HERSHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHENFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 May 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998