THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:21:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 549-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Duggan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duggan (CPSO#: 72631 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310 Extn: 2315

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 549-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 May 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 20 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Duggan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duggan (CPSO#: 72631 )
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 548-7827
Business Address: Department of Anaesthesia
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310 Extn: 2315

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT STANLEY DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT STANLEY DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998