THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
R. Faser Elliott Building
Ground Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3947
Fax: (416) 340-5466
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lian (CPSO#: 72686 )
Business Address: University Health Network
R. Fraser Building - Groud Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
R. Faser Elliott Building
Ground Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3947
Fax: (416) 340-5466
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lian (CPSO#: 72686 )
Business Address: University Health Network
R. Fraser Building - Groud Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALVIN TAI-IEN LIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CALVIN TAI-IEN LIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Nov 2012
Summary of Decision:
On November 26, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Calvin TaiIen Lian committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. Dr. Lian admitted the allegation.

Dr. Lian is a family physician practising emergency medicine in Toronto, Ontario.

On December 22, 2009, Dr. Lian pleaded to and was found guilty of one count of assault under section 266 of the Criminal Code in relation to an assault on his wife. He received a conditional discharge, contingent upon 18 months' probation. Prior to the 2009 assault which is the subject of this proceeding, Dr. Lian pleaded guilty to assault in relation to an assault on his wife in 2002, for which he received an absolute discharge.

Dr. Lian entered into individual and marital counselling in October 2009.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

( the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Lian's certificate of registration until the term referred to in paragraph (a) below has been completed:

(a) Dr. Lian shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in ethics facilitated by the College, relating to the ethical issues raised by his misconduct, such program to be completed at the earliest opportunity and in any case not later than within six (6) months of the date of this Order, with Dr. Lian to provide proof of successful completion of the program to the College within that time;

(b) Dr. Lian shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing this term of this Order.

( Dr. Lian appear before it to be reprimanded.

( Dr. Lian pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 26, 2012

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 26 Nov 2012
Summary of Decision:
On November 26, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Calvin TaiIen Lian committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise. Dr. Lian admitted the allegation.

Dr. Lian is a family physician practising emergency medicine in Toronto, Ontario.

On December 22, 2009, Dr. Lian pleaded to and was found guilty of one count of assault under section 266 of the Criminal Code in relation to an assault on his wife. He received a conditional discharge, contingent upon 18 months' probation. Prior to the 2009 assault which is the subject of this proceeding, Dr. Lian pleaded guilty to assault in relation to an assault on his wife in 2002, for which he received an absolute discharge.

Dr. Lian entered into individual and marital counselling in October 2009.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

( the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Lian's certificate of registration until the term referred to in paragraph (a) below has been completed:

(a) Dr. Lian shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in ethics facilitated by the College, relating to the ethical issues raised by his misconduct, such program to be completed at the earliest opportunity and in any case not later than within six (6) months of the date of this Order, with Dr. Lian to provide proof of successful completion of the program to the College within that time;

(b) Dr. Lian shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing this term of this Order.

( Dr. Lian appear before it to be reprimanded.

( Dr. Lian pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 26, 2012

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1998