THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-6480
Fax: (705) 743-6481

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Meade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Meade (CPSO#: 72690 )
Business Address: Kwartha Urology
Unit 101
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
(705) 743-6480
Business Address: 146 Oliver Street
Cobourg Ontario K0L 1L0
(905) 653-1140
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Northumberland Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 743-6480
Fax: (705) 743-6481

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 31 Dec 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Meade Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Meade (CPSO#: 72690 )
Business Address: Kwartha Urology
Unit 101
380 Burnham Street
Peterborough Ontario K9H 1T6
(705) 743-6480
Business Address: 146 Oliver Street
Cobourg Ontario K0L 1L0
(905) 653-1140
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Northumberland Hospital
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARSHALL MEADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEADE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM MARSHALL MEADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEADE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998