THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:43:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: Heinrichs, Stephanie Karen Block (Used Until: 28 Jul 1998)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Rd.
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Block Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Block (CPSO#: 72691 )
Business Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
(807) 343-8361

General Information

Former Name: Heinrichs, Stephanie Karen Block (Used Until: 28 Jul 1998)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Rd.
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 343-8361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Block Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Block (CPSO#: 72691 )
Business Address: Lakehead University Student Health
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5E1
(807) 343-8361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE KAREN BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE KAREN BLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998