THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:29:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Room 9 - EN 230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3893
Fax: (416) 340-3258

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fung (CPSO#: 72702 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 9 - EN 230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3893

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
Room 9 - EN 230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3893
Fax: (416) 340-3258

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Oct 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fung (CPSO#: 72702 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
Room 9 - EN 230
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-3893

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998