THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 07:22:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of General Surgery
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street - 4th floor
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 345-8345
Fax: (613) 345-8318

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davison & Hobden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davison (CPSO#: 72704 ) Dr. S. Hobden (CPSO#: 71492 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
4th Floor
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-8345

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of General Surgery
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street - 4th floor
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 345-8345
Fax: (613) 345-8318

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davison & Hobden Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Davison (CPSO#: 72704 ) Dr. S. Hobden (CPSO#: 71492 )
Business Address: Brockville General Hospital
Department of General Surgery
4th Floor
75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 345-8345

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN DAVISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN DAVISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2003
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998