THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:34:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 6-424
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2821
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuruvilla (CPSO#: 72717 )
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Room 6-424
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
(416) 946-2821

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room 6-424
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2821
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 21 Sep 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuruvilla (CPSO#: 72717 )
Business Address: 700 University Avenue
Room 6-424
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
(416) 946-2821

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998