THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:11:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Perth and Smith Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul C. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Miller (CPSO#: 72730 )
Business Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 267-7486

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Perth and Smith Falls District
Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul C. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Miller (CPSO#: 72730 )
Business Address: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 267-7486

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998