THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:00:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ferguson, Christie Lorian (Used Until: 05 Jul 2001)
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Dr
Suite LL03
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 775-0127
Fax: (705) 775-0134

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christie Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Freeman (CPSO#: 72757 )
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
LL03
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 775-0127

General Information

Former Name: Ferguson, Christie Lorian (Used Until: 05 Jul 2001)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Dr
Suite LL03
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 775-0127
Fax: (705) 775-0134

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christie Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Freeman (CPSO#: 72757 )
Business Address: The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
LL03
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
(705) 775-0127

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE LORIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIE LORIAN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998