THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:53:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Macklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macklin (CPSO#: 72775 )

Corporation Name: Macklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto Ontario M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Macklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macklin (CPSO#: 72775 )

Corporation Name: Macklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ARI MACKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKLIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ARI MACKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKLIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2003

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998