THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:10:50 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: R S McLaughlin Durham
Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 32805
Fax: (905) 721-4741

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariah Joshua Schattner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schattner (CPSO#: 72777 )
Business Address: R S McLaughlin Durham
Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 2805

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW
Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: R S McLaughlin Durham
Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Extension: 32805
Fax: (905) 721-4741

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ariah Joshua Schattner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Schattner (CPSO#: 72777 )
Business Address: R S McLaughlin Durham
Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711 Extn: 2805

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIAH JOSHUA SCHATTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHATTNER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARIAH JOSHUA SCHATTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHATTNER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998