THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-1550 Enterprise Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052644674
Extension: 153
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Unit 349
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: 4163389310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Harmantas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Harmantas (CPSO#: 72780 )
Business Address: Suite 335
5945 Airport Road
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1K9
(905) 678-2924
Business Address: Suite 105
4 Director Court
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3Z5
(905) 856-1033
Business Address: 1200 - 251 Consumers Road
North York Ontario M2J 4R3
(416) 572-8600
Business Address: Suite 101
1013 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1G1
(416) 636-9622
Business Address: 601 Rountree Dairy Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 5T8
(905) 851-9391
Business Address: 1550 Enterprise Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4
9052644674 Extn: 153

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-1550 Enterprise Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052644674
Extension: 153
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Unit 349
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Phone: 4163389310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Harmantas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Harmantas (CPSO#: 72780 )
Business Address: Suite 335
5945 Airport Road
Mississauga Ontario L4V 1K9
(905) 678-2924
Business Address: Suite 105
4 Director Court
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 3Z5
(905) 856-1033
Business Address: 1200 - 251 Consumers Road
North York Ontario M2J 4R3
(416) 572-8600
Business Address: Suite 101
1013 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1G1
(416) 636-9622
Business Address: 601 Rountree Dairy Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 5T8
(905) 851-9391
Business Address: 1550 Enterprise Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4
9052644674 Extn: 153

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKOLAOS HARMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMANTAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIKOLAOS HARMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMANTAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998