THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:45:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Road
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: (416) 461-1670

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lachmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lachmann (CPSO#: 72842 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
(416) 461-8252 Extn: 2755

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Bridgepoint Road
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: (416) 461-1670

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Lachmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lachmann (CPSO#: 72842 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
(416) 461-8252 Extn: 2755

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK HERBERT LACHMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACHMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK HERBERT LACHMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACHMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998