THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:10:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
460 Wellington Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 6H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-5670
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian Paradis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paradis (CPSO#: 72874 )
Business Address: 301 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 6H9
(519) 631-5679

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
460 Wellington Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 6H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-5670
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian Paradis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paradis (CPSO#: 72874 )
Business Address: 301 - 460 Wellington Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 6H9
(519) 631-5679

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN PARADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARADIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN PARADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARADIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1998