THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:33:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavillion 1 503
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5405
Fax: (516) 603-5324

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derrick Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chang (CPSO#: 72888 )
Business Address: 5 - 1310 Don Mills Road
North York Ontario M3B 2W6
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: 101 - 50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham Ontario L3T 7X8
(905) 731-7232
Business Address: 109 - 55 Town Centre Court
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4X4
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: GS 480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Room 1-503
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5405

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Fell Pavillion 1 503
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5405
Fax: (516) 603-5324

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derrick Chang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chang (CPSO#: 72888 )
Business Address: 5 - 1310 Don Mills Road
North York Ontario M3B 2W6
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: 101 - 50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham Ontario L3T 7X8
(905) 731-7232
Business Address: 109 - 55 Town Centre Court
Scarborough Ontario M1P 4X4
(905) 855-1860
Business Address: GS 480 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 2C4
(416) 340-3856
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Room 1-503
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5405

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERRICK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERRICK CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Aug 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1999

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1998