THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:19:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardio-Vascular Surgery Department
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197443311
Extension: 6428
Fax: (905) 306-7607
Address: Grand Revier Hospital
Critical Care medicine Department
P.O.Box 9056
835 King Street west
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Extension: 2631
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1370 DUNDAS ST. E SUITE 206
Mississauga Ontario L4Y4G4
Phone: 9053060220
Fax: 9053067607
Address: 4188 Living Arts Drive
Med Square Medical Centre
unit 5
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G7
Phone: 9058083002
Fax: 18888909293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 23 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ben Musa (CPSO#: 72892 )
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B3
(519) 744-3311 Extn: 6428

Corporation Name: Dr. Anas Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2009

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Mary's General Hospital
Cardio-Vascular Surgery Department
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M1B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197443311
Extension: 6428
Fax: (905) 306-7607
Address: Grand Revier Hospital
Critical Care medicine Department
P.O.Box 9056
835 King Street west
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Extension: 2631
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1370 DUNDAS ST. E SUITE 206
Mississauga Ontario L4Y4G4
Phone: 9053060220
Fax: 9053067607
Address: 4188 Living Arts Drive
Med Square Medical Centre
unit 5
Mississauga Ontario L5B 0G7
Phone: 9058083002
Fax: 18888909293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 23 Jun 2005
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ben Musa (CPSO#: 72892 )
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
Critical Care Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B3
(519) 744-3311 Extn: 6428

Corporation Name: Dr. Anas Ben Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2009

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS AHMED T BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANAS AHMED T BEN MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEN MUSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2004
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2006
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 May 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 May 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2005

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2004

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1998