THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 21:14:09 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 748-4996
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Visser & Carpentier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Visser (CPSO#: 72927 ) Dr. M. Carpentier (CPSO#: 78479 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 748-4996
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Visser & Carpentier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Visser (CPSO#: 72927 ) Dr. M. Carpentier (CPSO#: 78479 )
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN LAURENS VISSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISSER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN LAURENS VISSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISSER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1998