THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:43:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
4E11
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73177
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Address: Suite WB 127
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Extension: 23575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devin C. Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Peterson (CPSO#: 72934 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Site
Room 4E11
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73177
Business Address: David Bradley Sport & Rehab Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 525-9140 Extn: 23575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
4E11
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73177
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Address: Suite WB 127
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Extension: 23575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Devin C. Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Peterson (CPSO#: 72934 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Site
Room 4E11
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 73177
Business Address: David Bradley Sport & Rehab Centre
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 525-9140 Extn: 23575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVIN CLARKE PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEVIN CLARKE PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1998