THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences - LHSC
University Campus, Room B10 - 106
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3348
Fax: (519) 663-3440
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705)728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5470
Fax: (519) 464-4564
Address: Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4752
Fax: (705) 675-4796

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirsattari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mirsattari (CPSO#: 72937 )
Business Address: Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
1st Floor, South Tower
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 675-4793
Business Address: 1st Floor
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Address: 960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 566-4282 Extn: 3220
Business Address: Department of Clinical Neurology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
B10-106 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3348
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, TURKISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Clinical Neurological
Sciences - LHSC
University Campus, Room B10 - 106
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3348
Fax: (519) 663-3440
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705)728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5470
Fax: (519) 464-4564
Address: Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4752
Fax: (705) 675-4796

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirsattari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mirsattari (CPSO#: 72937 )
Business Address: Health Science North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
1st Floor, South Tower
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 675-4793
Business Address: 1st Floor
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Address: 960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3A 2T4
(705) 566-4282 Extn: 3220
Business Address: Department of Clinical Neurology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
B10-106 - 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3348
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED MOHAMMAD MIRSATTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRSATTARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED MOHAMMAD MIRSATTARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRSATTARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Mar 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2000

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Mar 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1998