THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:14:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Jul 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital, 76 Stuart St, Connell 7, Kingston K7L 2V7
Date Received: 08 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Melanson (CPSO#: 72818 ) Dr. G. Pari (CPSO#: 72984 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 13 Jul 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Kingston General Hospital, 76 Stuart St, Connell 7, Kingston K7L 2V7
Date Received: 08 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melanson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Melanson (CPSO#: 72818 ) Dr. G. Pari (CPSO#: 72984 )

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Apr 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1998
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1998